NY S03480 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 3480A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 3480A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that notice be given to the community boards when there is a change in service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities or the omnibus line facilities of the New York city transit authority.
Title
Requires that notice be given to the community boards when there is a change in service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities or the omnibus line facilities of the New York city transit authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3480A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03977 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION