NY S03471 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the excelsior jobs program and certain incentives for medical equipment projects within such program.
Title
Extends the excelsior jobs program and certain incentives for medical equipment projects within such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.607 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |