NY S03470 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of labor, in conjunction with the commissioner of health, to develop a program which incentivizes unemployed individuals to enter jobs in healthcare.
Title
Directs the commissioner of labor, in conjunction with the commissioner of health, to develop a program which incentivizes unemployed individuals to enter jobs in healthcare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |