NY S03469 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3469B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to tax exemptions for community land trusts and income-restricted homeownership property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to tax exemptions for community land trusts and income-restricted homeownership property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 3469B
2020-03-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2020-03-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 3469A
2020-03-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-07SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05081 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - print number 5081a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback