NY S03458 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3458A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 3458A
2022-03-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2021-01-29SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A03960 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback