NY S03457 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing a court to waive certain surcharges and fees; authorizes a court to waive certain surcharges and fees for a defendant under the age of 21 under certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to allowing a court to waive certain surcharges and fees; authorizes a court to waive certain surcharges and fees for a defendant under the age of 21 under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.144 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.768 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3457 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.192 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.132 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.132 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-07 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5045 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.768 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1682 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05045 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.144