NY S03447 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Title
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.374 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1295 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04247 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law