NY S03444 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Junior, Mohansic and Sparkle lakes as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates Junior, Mohansic and Sparkle lakes as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-03-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.286
2019-02-07SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A03098 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - print number 3098a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback