NY S03430 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public officers and public bodies to make proactive efforts to provide qualified interpreters at no charge for the hearing impaired at public meetings and hearings upon written request to the public officer responsible for the siting of such hearing; requires installation and use of assistive listening devices.
Title
Requires public officers and public bodies to make proactive efforts to provide qualified interpreters at no charge for the hearing impaired at public meetings and hearings upon written request to the public officer responsible for the siting of such hearing; requires installation and use of assistive listening devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3430B |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3430A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.395 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |