NY S03415 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any person charged with enforcing laws prohibiting cruelty to animals shall cause a report to be made when, in the performance of his or her duties, such person has reasonable cause to believe that abuse or maltreatment of a child has also occurred; also provides that a person charged with the responsibility of filing a report of child abuse or maltreatment shall also file a report of suspected animal cruelty.
Title
Provides that any person charged with enforcing laws prohibiting cruelty to animals shall cause a report to be made when, in the performance of his or her duties, such person has reasonable cause to believe that abuse or maltreatment of a child has also occurred; also provides that a person charged with the responsibility of filing a report of child abuse or maltreatment shall also file a report of suspected animal cruelty.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.610 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.891 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3415A |
2019-04-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A01211 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families