NY S03407 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the formation of a cyber security advisory board and the implementation of a cyber security initiative.
Title
Requires the formation of a cyber security advisory board and the implementation of a cyber security initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.587 |
2016-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3407A |
2016-01-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.77 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06130 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - print number 6130a