NY S03407 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the class D felony of criminal fortification of a drug house for the fortification of a building, used for drug trade, to prevent the lawful entry by the police or other persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the class D felony of criminal fortification of a drug house for the fortification of a building, used for drug trade, to prevent the lawful entry by the police or other persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-09Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.577
2014-01-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 3407B
2014-01-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-13Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1326
2013-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-03-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 3407A
2013-03-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2013-02-01SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A05709 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - held for consideration in codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback