NY S03407 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6270B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to remote net metering by farm and non-residential customer-generators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to remote net metering by farm and non-residential customer-generators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-09SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6270B
2011-05-02SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3407A
2011-03-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-03-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-03-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.143
2011-02-18SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06270 (Same As) 2011-06-01 - signed chap.35

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback