NY S03394 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification in the case of a change to the workers' compensation claims representative.
Title
Relates to notification in the case of a change to the workers' compensation claims representative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.195 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3394A |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00358 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor