NY S03360 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to home heating system conversion; requires written notice regarding such conversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to home heating system conversion; requires written notice regarding such conversion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.450
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a6193a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1424
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 3360A
2019-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A06193 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s3360a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback