NY S03352 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts breast pump replacement parts and certain supplies from sales and compensating use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts breast pump replacement parts and certain supplies from sales and compensating use taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A00715 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback