NY S03352 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3352A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3352A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts breast pump replacement parts and certain supplies from sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Exempts breast pump replacement parts and certain supplies from sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3352A |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A00715 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - print number 715a