NY S03340 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires extreme risk protection orders to be reported to the statewide computerized registry of orders of protection and certain warrants of arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires extreme risk protection orders to be reported to the statewide computerized registry of orders of protection and certain warrants of arrest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading cal.309
2024-05-22Assemblysubstituted for a5873
2024-05-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-05-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.140
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-09Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-05-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.411
2023-01-30SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05873 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - substituted by s3340

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback