NY S03335 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of flooding prevention and mitigation to manage and coordinate the work of task forces, commissions, and other bodies and programs tasked with examining issues related to flooding, to review and assess best practices and make recommendations regarding flood prevention and mitigation, and to assist municipalities in developing strategies and policies to combat flooding.
Title
Establishes the office of flooding prevention and mitigation to manage and coordinate the work of task forces, commissions, and other bodies and programs tasked with examining issues related to flooding, to review and assess best practices and make recommendations regarding flood prevention and mitigation, and to assist municipalities in developing strategies and policies to combat flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.131 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3335A |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00132 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - print number 132a