NY S03332 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words inmate or inmates with the words incarcerated individual or incarcerated individuals or variation thereof.
Title
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words inmate or inmates with the words incarcerated individual or incarcerated individuals or variation thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2395 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.826 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02395 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - signed chap.322