NY S03331 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of ingredients in personal care products and cosmetics to include chemicals of concern which shall be provided on lists identified by the commissioner.
Title
Relates to the regulation of ingredients in personal care products and cosmetics to include chemicals of concern which shall be provided on lists identified by the commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3331B |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1100 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3331A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00143 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - print number 143a