NY S03320 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a residential condominium owner's bill of rights that includes the right to transparency, the right to timely decisions, voting rights, the right to notice, and the right against extraordinary expenses.
Title
Creates a residential condominium owner's bill of rights that includes the right to transparency, the right to timely decisions, voting rights, the right to notice, and the right against extraordinary expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.139 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.500 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06241 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing