NY S03310 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 3310A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 3310A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts mortgages of residential real property from taxation when property is purchased by owners receiving state or federal buyout of their prior residence destroyed in hurricane Sandy.
Title
Exempts mortgages of residential real property from taxation when property is purchased by owners receiving state or federal buyout of their prior residence destroyed in hurricane Sandy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3310A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.398 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03585 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 3585a