NY S03308 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the continuation of express bus service to the south shore of Staten Island.
Title
Provides for the continuation of express bus service to the south shore of Staten Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.384 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3308A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03586 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 3586a