NY S03306 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3306B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3306B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for members of retirement systems by increasing the base benefit amount for computation to $21,000.
Title
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for members of retirement systems by increasing the base benefit amount for computation to $21,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3306B |
2018-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3306A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06045 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental employees