NY S03288 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder as well as other developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder as well as other developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1721 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3288A |
2016-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01203 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - print number 1203a