NY S03281 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a renewable hydrogen incentive and financing program to engage stakeholders to design and implement a competitive program for renewable hydrogen production for the purpose of meeting the state's clean energy and greenhouse emissions reductions targets.
Title
Relates to establishing a renewable hydrogen incentive and financing program to engage stakeholders to design and implement a competitive program for renewable hydrogen production for the purpose of meeting the state's clean energy and greenhouse emissions reductions targets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03788 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means