NY S03274 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 3274A
2018-05-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2017-01-20SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02125 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - print number 2125a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback