NY S03272 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3272A
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3272A
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state crisis intervention demonstration program and a crisis intervention team training fund.
Title
Establishes a state crisis intervention demonstration program and a crisis intervention team training fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3272A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-10 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |