NY S03266 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain provisions be included in any procurement or agreement prior to disposing of any asset owned, leased or otherwise controlled on or in the immediate vicinity of the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge.
Title
Requires certain provisions be included in any procurement or agreement prior to disposing of any asset owned, leased or otherwise controlled on or in the immediate vicinity of the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.74 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.178 |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | substituted for a724 |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.326 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00724 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - substituted by s3266