NY S03263 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public corporations and agencies to provide notice to each minority- or women-owned business enterprise that unsuccessfully bid on a contract of the reason or reasons why the business enterprise was unsuccessful in obtaining the contract.
Title
Requires public corporations and agencies to provide notice to each minority- or women-owned business enterprise that unsuccessfully bid on a contract of the reason or reasons why the business enterprise was unsuccessful in obtaining the contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.328 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05536 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions