NY S03261 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to allowing attorneys having offices in the state to reside in an adjoining state.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to allowing attorneys having offices in the state to reside in an adjoining state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-04-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.363 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02218 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - reported referred to rules