NY S03253 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to recording certain law enforcement activities; provides that a person not under arrest or in the custody of a law enforcement official has the right to record police activity and to maintain custody and control of that recording and of any property or instruments used by that person to record police activities, however, a person in custody or under arrest does not, by that status alone, forfeit such right to record.
Title
Relates to recording certain law enforcement activities; provides that a person not under arrest or in the custody of a law enforcement official has the right to record police activity and to maintain custody and control of that recording and of any property or instruments used by that person to record police activities, however, a person in custody or under arrest does not, by that status alone, forfeit such right to record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.100 |
2020-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.70 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1360a |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.678 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3253A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01360 (Same As) 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.100