NY S03249 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of any motor vehicle equipped with a device which affects the operation of traffic-control signals; provides that the possession of such a device shall constitute a traffic infraction, use thereof is a class A misdemeanor, and use which results in personal injury or death shall constitute a class E felony.
Title
Prohibits the operation of any motor vehicle equipped with a device which affects the operation of traffic-control signals; provides that the possession of such a device shall constitute a traffic infraction, use thereof is a class A misdemeanor, and use which results in personal injury or death shall constitute a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.760 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00278 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation