NY S03229 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2024 and before January 1, 2026.
Title
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2024 and before January 1, 2026.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-04-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.756 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.548 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3229A |
2021-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A07343 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation