NY S03222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 3222
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a 60 day license suspension for any driver convicted of 2 speeding violations within a school zone, committed within an 18 month period of time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a 60 day license suspension for any driver convicted of 2 speeding violations within a school zone, committed within an 18 month period of time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateAMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 3222
2019-05-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 3222A
2019-05-07SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A00704 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - print number 704a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback