NY S03221 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the statewide fibroid study program to study fibroids, the treatment of fibroids, potential barriers to the access of treatment for fibroids, and differences in symptoms and access to treatment for women of color.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the statewide fibroid study program to study fibroids, the treatment of fibroids, potential barriers to the access of treatment for fibroids, and differences in symptoms and access to treatment for women of color.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12Assemblyreferred to health
2024-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.483
2024-02-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 3221A
2024-02-22SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-02-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-31Assemblyreferred to health
2023-05-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1256
2023-01-30SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A00545 (Same As) 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback