NY S03203 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sale and installation of commercial solar energy systems equipment from sales and compensating use taxes; grants municipalities the option to grant such exemption from local sales and use taxes.
Title
Exempts the sale and installation of commercial solar energy systems equipment from sales and compensating use taxes; grants municipalities the option to grant such exemption from local sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.7 |
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.406 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5522b |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.792 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3203B |
2012-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.957 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3203A |
2011-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05522 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s3203b