NY S03196 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a curriculum and task force to provide housing navigation services for those with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Title
Establishes a curriculum and task force to provide housing navigation services for those with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Sen. William Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2023-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03856 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means