NY S03195 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a capped real property school tax rate for persons seventy years of age or older who meet the eligibility requirements for the enhanced school tax relief exemption.
Title
Establishes a capped real property school tax rate for persons seventy years of age or older who meet the eligibility requirements for the enhanced school tax relief exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1023 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A02533 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to real property taxation