NY S03175 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides information regarding termination of medicare part B coverage for the duration of incarceration to individuals committed to the department of corrections and community supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides information regarding termination of medicare part B coverage for the duration of incarceration to individuals committed to the department of corrections and community supervision.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-29SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A5396
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1269
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2023-01-30SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A05396 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback