NY S03159 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits unfair discrimination by insurers for individuals that use prescriptions to block the effects of opioids.
Title
Prohibits unfair discrimination by insurers for individuals that use prescriptions to block the effects of opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.228 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.163 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5952a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.71 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.464 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3159A |
2019-03-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05952 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228