NY S03156 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating annual reporting obligations by municipal housing authorities to the authorities budget office with respect to state-funded activities of such municipal housing authorities.
Title
Relates to creating annual reporting obligations by municipal housing authorities to the authorities budget office with respect to state-funded activities of such municipal housing authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1186 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3156A |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.411 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02650 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - print number 2650a