NY S03149 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to provide for an economic bill of rights for the citizens of the state.
Title
Amends the constitution to provide for an economic bill of rights for the citizens of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-04-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |