NY S03131 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the rates of reimbursement made through the New York state Medicaid durable medical equipment, orthotics, prosthetics and supplies program for rate adequacy and patient access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the rates of reimbursement made through the New York state Medicaid durable medical equipment, orthotics, prosthetics and supplies program for rate adequacy and patient access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17SenateVETOED MEMO.75
2023-11-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-05-24Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-24Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.238
2023-05-24Assemblysubstituted for a5113
2023-03-28Assemblyreferred to health
2023-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-03-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.524
2023-01-27SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A05113 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - substituted by s3131

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback