NY S03126 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to women's health in correctional facilities; establishes a women's health education program; provides access to pregnancy counseling services; authorizes a support person to accompany an inmate during delivery; requires HIV and STD testing to be offered to women inmates; provides pregnant inmates with access to prenatal vitamins as well as a specialized diet tailored to pregnancy needs; requires a study and report on women's health in prison.
Title
Relates to women's health in correctional facilities; establishes a women's health education program; provides access to pregnancy counseling services; authorizes a support person to accompany an inmate during delivery; requires HIV and STD testing to be offered to women inmates; provides pregnant inmates with access to prenatal vitamins as well as a specialized diet tailored to pregnancy needs; requires a study and report on women's health in prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.605 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A00118 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means