NY S03125 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires feminine hygiene products to be offered for free in charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires feminine hygiene products to be offered for free in charter schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A290
2019-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.138
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A00290 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback