NY S03116 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that persons with a disability shall be eligible to receive a fishing license for five dollars.
Title
Provides that persons with a disability shall be eligible to receive a fishing license for five dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.535 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1141 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3116A |
2023-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05907 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation