NY S03112 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes provisions of law related to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes provisions of law related to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river permanent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.301
2019-09-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.142
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a5960
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1291
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A05960 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3112

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback