NY S03107 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a temporary task force on the variable supplements fund program to make findings and recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a temporary task force on the variable supplements fund program to make findings and recommendations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.917
2019-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 3107A
2019-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06020 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - print number 6020a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback